judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COHEN VS. MIRAGE RESORTS

Case Information: 36434
Short Caption:COHEN VS. MIRAGE RESORTSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45247
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A408662Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/08/2001 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/08/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harrison Kemp & Jones, Chtd.--check no. 19183.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-12252
08/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13432
11/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 14, 2000. 00-19896
12/18/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 12/14/00. 00-21998
12/18/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-21999
01/19/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 16, 2001. 01-01221
02/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Unopposed). 01-02536
02/09/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The answering brief of respondent Mirage Resorts Inc. shall be served and filed on or before March 19, 2001. 01-02671
02/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. All respondents in this action are represented by the law firm of SCHRECK BRIGNONE GODFREY, James J. Pisanelli and Todd L. Bice. 01-03035
02/16/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Clarify Order Granting Unopposed Extension of Time to file Answering Brief. 01-03036
02/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Order Granting Motion for Clarification. The respondents in this appeal shall have to and including March 19, 2001, to file a single answering brief. 01-03515
03/22/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/20/01. 01-05070
04/25/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 04/23/01. 01-06943
04/25/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 8, 2001, at 11:30 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
09/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/08/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
02/07/2003Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. By the Court, Becker, J. I concur: Shearing, J. Rose, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. 119 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. NNP02-MS/RR/NB 03-02185
02/28/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Schreck Brignone - check no. 025817.
02/28/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing/Clarification. Mailed on: February 25, 2003. 03-03334
03/14/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP02-MS/RR/NB 03-04375
04/08/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-04591
04/08/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/28/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 10, 2003. 03-04591