judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANNETTE HENNEGHAN V. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0322
Short Caption:ANNETTE HENNEGHAN V. COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0297 Consolidated:11-CV-0322, 11-CV-0460
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4158-08Filed Date:03/03/2011

Opening Event Date:03/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnnette Henneghan N
Thomas J. HendersonNN
David W. SanfordNN
Stefanie F. Roemer NN
AppelleeCountrywide Home LoansN
Thomas M. HefferonNN
AppelleeWashington Technology GroupN
Roger W. Heald NN
AppelleeExpress TitleN
Aaron L. HandlemanNY
Michael Freije NN
AppelleeEric Fedewa NPro SeN
AppelleeBlack Roger Y
AppelleeDoretha Austin NPro SeN
AppelleeCharles Tobias N
Aaron L. HandlemanNY
Michael Freije NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/31/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that transcript may be needed for appeal no. 11-CV-297, and no transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-322, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-297 and 11-CV-322 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that, in appeal no. 11-CV-297 appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and filed with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s)necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject appeal no. 11-CV-297 to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index(es) and transcripts as required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (11CV297) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/1/10) (elp)
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (103-pgs/hawkins 11/1/10 proc.)w/cd
04/25/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CV-322)
04/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/02/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED 1629 K St., N.W. -- Ste 260, WDC 20036 (aple)
05/03/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeals in these matters, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-460, and it further appearing that the complete records on appeal have been filed in appeals nos. 11-CV-297 and 11-CV-322, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal no. 11-CV-460 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 11-CV-297 and 11-CV-322 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
05/03/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court of the record index, for appeal no. 11-CV-460, in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX 11CV297
05/10/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv460 & 11-CV-646
05/13/2011 It appearing that the complete records on appeal have been filed with this court, it is ORDEREd that appellants' briefs and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 22, 2011 (unopposed) (Fitzhugh,et al; Henneghan and Saucier)
06/23/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for extension of time to file the brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 22, 2011. (JAC) elp
07/19/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant Armstrong)Granted
07/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal (Appellant Armstrong) PENDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
10/27/2011FiledOrder directing appellants to submit the status statement accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
11/04/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 10/27/11, mailed to appellee Eric Fedewa at 421 Royal Tern Road S. Ponte Vedra Beach Fl, 32082-7223, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as with the following forwarding address 325 Sea Lake Ln Ponte Vedra, FL 32082-4756 and remailed to this address this date. elp (Appellee Fedewa)
11/10/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellant Fitzhugh)Granted
11/22/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeals (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)Granted
12/09/2011FiledStatement regarding (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Appellant Fitzhugh)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeals (Appellant Fitzhugh, et al)
12/09/2011FiledDismissed
12/14/2011FiledReceived Order dated 12/9/11, mailed to appellee Eric Fedewa at 421 Royal Tern Road S, Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-7223 and returned by the U.S. P.S. with the following forwarding address below: 325 N Sea Lake Ln, Ponte Vedra FL 32082-4756 and remailed to appellee at this address this date. elp (Appellee Fedewa)
12/30/2011FiledMandate