judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENISE MENDENHALL v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming insurance company

Case Heading (S-11-0189)
Case Number:S-11-0189Case Docketed On:08/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:DENISE MENDENHALL v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming insurance company
Full Title:DENISE MENDENHALL, Appellant (Defendant), v. MOUNTAIN WEST FARM BUREAU MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Wyoming insurance company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDenise MendenhallAmanda Kay Roberts
Jeffrey J. Gonda
AppelleeMountain West Farm Bureau Mutal Insurance CompanyGeorge E. Powers Jr.
John Zachary Courson
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverAlisha RocovitsRick L. Koehmstedt

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Insurance Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 46
Citation:274 P.3d 407

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata - brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
10/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's brief errataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2011Motion - StrikeMotionStrikeFinal
12/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Strike Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/06/2011Response/Objection - Motion to StrikeResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's response to appellant's motion to strike appellee's appendix; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/09/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting George E. Powers, Jr. for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeffrey J. Gonda and Amanda K. Roberts for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2011Order - Denying Motion to Strike Appellee's AppendixOrderDenyFinal
01/12/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jeffrey J. Gonda and Amanda K. Roberts for appellant; John Z. Courson and George E. Powers, Jr., argument by Mr. Powers for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/12/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/13/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal