judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HENRY H. BLACK v. AMEICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: B-2805
B-2805
06/17/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HENRY H. BLACK
AMEICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/16/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/09/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/05/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/09/1971Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
07/15/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/02/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1972Response to Motion filed
01/20/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/05/1972Opinion issued
11/16/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/09/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/05/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
09/09/1971Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
07/15/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/02/1971Response to Petition
06/17/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/17/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ameican Bankers Insurance CompanyRespondent
Charles R. ShaddoxAmicus Curiae
Thompson, Coe, Cousins, Irons and PorterAmicus Curiae
Henry H. BlackPetitioner
Wade Spilman and Peter M. LowryAmicus Curiae
Thomas C. Lucky, Independent Executor of the Estate of Gladys LongAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information