judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HINOJOSA, JR. (MANUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36430
Short Caption:HINOJOSA, JR. (MANUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37170
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154304Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12220
07/14/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Minutes. Due Date: 10 days
08/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. District Court Minutes. 00-14148
08/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Redesignation of Appeal/Fast Track. Upon further review, it has been determined that appellant was represented by trial counsel in the district court. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.)
09/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17164
10/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. To date, attorney Gilkey has failed to submit proof of service of the motion filed on September 28, 2000. In the interest of judicial efficiency we grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the fast track statement and appendix received on October 13, 2000. We caution counsel that all document submitted in the future for filing, must be accompanied by proof of service on all parties to the appeal. 00-18319
10/16/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-18235
10/16/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-18236
11/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-19539
11/07/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-19540
11/28/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, " . . . the judgment of conviction is affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20807
12/27/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20813
12/27/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 29, 2000. 00-20813