judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYAG (ALBERTO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36429
Short Caption:TAYAG (ALBERTO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141134Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12219
07/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the Record on Appeal due: 120 days. Record must include any previously prepared transcripts. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12996
08/07/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 7/31/00. 00-13627
08/07/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Notice of Entry of Order filed in district court on 8/11/00. 00-13628
11/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 00-20188
11/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20417
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20578
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20578