judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH RANDALL OWENS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0184)
Case Number:S-11-0184Case Docketed On:08/09/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JOSEPH RANDALL OWENS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSEPH RANDALL OWENS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph Randall OwensDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 14
Citation:269 P.3d 1093

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/09/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/03/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young and Joshua Beau Taylor to appear and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/22/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/01/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II - Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/06/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/27/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal