judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM JAMES WITKOWSKI V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0317
Short Caption:WILLIAM JAMES WITKOWSKI V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD12549-10Filed Date:03/09/2011

Opening Event Date:03/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/19/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/18/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/16/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam James Witkowski N
Danny C. Onorato NN
Lisa Hertzer SchertlerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ann K. SimonYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (128pgs/Tape) 1/26/11 proc.
04/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (177pgs/Tape) 1/28/11 proc. w/CD
04/14/2011RECORD INDEX
04/14/2011RECORD COPIES
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (21pgs/Tape) 1/31/11 proc. w/CD attached
04/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 21, 2011 (no oppo)
06/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (46pgs/Tape) 1/26/11 proc. w/CD (morning session)
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until August 22, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 22, 2011. Any furthe requests for extensions of time will be looked upon wtih disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause
08/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until September 1, 2011 (Appellant)(no oppo).Granted
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix until September 1, 2011
09/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
10/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 14, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
10/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
10/19/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/29/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the reply brief
11/29/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/18/2012FiledArgued Before Thompson,Oberly,Farrell Lisa Hertzer Scherlter Esq.,for appellant Mark Aziz Esq.,for appellee
06/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/16/2012FiledMandate