judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2821
B-2821
06/24/1971
Application for Writ of Error
DAMASIO C. RIVAS
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/21/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/11/1972Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/08/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/26/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/14/1972Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/16/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/11/1971Letter brief Respondent
07/09/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/24/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/21/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1972Reply to Response
07/05/1972Response to Motion filed
06/29/1972Motion to Stay Filed Overruled
06/08/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/24/1972Opinion issued
01/26/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/14/1972Supplemental Brief filed
11/16/1971Response to Brief filed
11/11/1971Letter brief
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/09/1971Response to Petition
06/24/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/24/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Liberty Mutual Insurance CompanyRespondent
Damasio C. RivasPetitioner
Sam P. BurfordAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information