judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS VS. ELDORADO HOTEL

Case Information: 36431
Short Caption:THOMAS VS. ELDORADO HOTELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9803310Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Cashill, Wm.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/30/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12236
07/18/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on July 3, 2000. 00-12413
07/18/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Patterson Cashill. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/17/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-18378
10/17/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/25/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18833
11/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-20440
11/29/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on November 13, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-20871
11/29/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-19851
12/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-21328
12/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-21410
02/14/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Original Exhibits from District Court. 01-02951
02/22/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 22, 2001. 01-21956
03/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-05099
08/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall obtain and transmit the original exhibits consisting of a large medical file that was utilized in the District Court and at the administrative appeals level and transmit the original exhibits to this court within 30 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 45 days from the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed according to the provisions of NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-13196
08/09/2001ExhibitReceived Exhibit (original). Volumes 1 through 3 of file entitled "Original Record on Appeal in Accordance with the Nevada Administrative Procedure Act (Exhibits Attached)." 01-13495
09/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
09/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
09/24/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/24/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-16080
09/24/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-16082
10/24/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 23, 2001. 01-17910
11/27/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/26/01. 01-19838
11/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-19839
12/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 28, 2002. 01-21507
01/28/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
01/30/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/30/02 (Reno/Carson). Signed by: Martin G. Crowley. 02-02013
04/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-07595
04/30/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
09/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15632
10/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-15813
10/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2002. 02-15813
10/14/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Exhibits: Volumes 1 through 3 of file entitled "Original Record on Appeal in Accordance with the Nevada Administrative Procedure Act (Exhibits Attached)." this day. 02-15813
10/23/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Exhibits: Volume 2 of file entitled "Original Record on Appeal in Accordance with the Nevada Administrative Procedure Act (Exhibits Attached) this day. 02-15813
10/23/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on October 22, 2002. 02-15813
12/23/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2002. 02-15813