judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IRA CHALPHIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0319
Short Caption:IRA CHALPHIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9763-10Filed Date:03/11/2011

Opening Event Date:03/11/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/30/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIra Chalphin NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/24/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, provide this court with the necessary documentation to support the appointment of counsel, or file a motion and fully completed financial information statment to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24 (3). Failure to comply with this order may result in appellant being deemed as proceeding pro se. (By: JAC)
04/21/2011 ORDERED, ss, that appellant shall proceed on appeal pro se. It is F/O that appellant shall w/in 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is F/O that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/out further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (ETW)
06/08/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
06/08/2011DISMISSED
06/30/2011MANDATE ISSUED