judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HIGH PLAINS NATURAL GAS COMPANY v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS

Case: B-2812
B-2812
06/21/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HIGH PLAINS NATURAL GAS COMPANY
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/16/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/05/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/01/1971Response to PetitionIntervenor
06/21/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/25/1971Response to Motion filed
10/22/1971Response to Motion filed
10/20/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/16/1971Reply to Response
07/05/1971Response to Petition
07/01/1971Response to Petition
06/21/1971Response to Petition
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
06/21/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Perryton, TexasIntervenor
High Plains Natural Gas CompanyPetitioner
Railroad Commission of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information