Case: 06-94-00214-CR
06-94-00214-CR
08/31/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
McIntyre, Angus Joseph
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/23/1996 | Motion Disposed | Overruled | |
04/15/1996 | MOTION FILED | | |
04/03/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/16/1995 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/16/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
02/15/1995 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
02/14/1995 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/06/1995 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
12/23/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/14/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
10/18/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
09/29/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/22/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
08/31/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/31/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/03/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
McIntyre, Angus Joseph | Appellant | |
Angus Joseph Mcintyre | Appellant | Mr. Angus Josephe McIntyre Jr. |
Trial Court Information
102nd District Court
Red River
135-CR-8-93
37 years TDCJ