judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOUGLAS WARDRICK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0315
Short Caption:DOUGLAS WARDRICK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3377-10Filed Date:03/11/2011

Opening Event Date:03/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDouglas Wardrick Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kendra D. BriggsYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond J. Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond J. Rigat, Esquire
04/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (pii)
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (110 pgs/Janifer) 9/9/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (321 pgs/Armstrong) 9/13-14/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (55 pgs/Shelton) 9/15-16/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (15 pgs/tape) 2/16/11 proc. w/cd
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX
07/01/2011RECORD COPIES
07/01/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (Sealed pleadings)
07/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until October 20, 2011 (Appellee)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 10/20/11
10/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/17/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/16/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Reid
03/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and reid, Senior Judge.)
04/04/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/11/2012FiledMandate
05/07/2012FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel to file a Petition for Writ Certiorariin the United States Supreme Court (Appellant)Denied
05/16/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for appointment of counsel.
09/14/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
09/19/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
04/26/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE