judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVIS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36427
Short Caption:DAVIS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37128 , 38588
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126518Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12215
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. We deny as moot appellant's motion to stay notice of appeal.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14315
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14487
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14487