Case Heading (S-11-0182) | |||||
Case Number: | S-11-0182 | Case Docketed On: | 08/08/2011 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7) | ||
Short Title: | JOSEPH DAX v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | JOSEPH DAX, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Joseph F. Dax | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Gregory A. Phillips Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Justin A. Daraie |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served |
Opinion Number: | 2012 WY 40 |
Citation: | 272 P.3d 319 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/08/2011 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/08/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from DC but no NOA received | Final | |
08/08/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
09/19/2011 | Brief - Appellant. No dated certificate of service; brief dated 09/08/2011, cover letter dated 09/14/2011 and envelope postmarked 09/15/2011. Due date for Appellee's brief calculated from postmark. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/07/2011 | Motion - Supplement the record. Filed motion for permission to modify the record pursuant to WRAP 3.04 Appellants Brief with recently acquired transcript under WRAP 3.05(d). | Motion | Supplement the record | Final | |
10/31/2011 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/01/2011 | Order - Denying Motion to Modify the Record | Order | Deny | Final | |
11/01/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/02/2011 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
11/09/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to the Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/21/2011 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
11/21/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/28/2011 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
11/28/2011 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/28/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/19/2012 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order - affirmed. Justice Hill writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/04/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/04/2012 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/04/2012 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/10/2012 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/9/2012. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
04/16/2012 | Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition for writ of certiorari filed | Notice-Incoming | U.S. Supreme Court | Final |