Case Information: 36428 | |||
Short Caption: | DAUGHTERY (TERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146509 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/18/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/14/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-12218 | |
08/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36415, 36428, 36441, 36443, 36474, 36475. Document No. 00-13570. | ||
12/18/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 00-22001 | |
12/18/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/11/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-17156 | |
11/07/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-17349 | |
11/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/15/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. | 01-17349 |