judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHARLES MORONESE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0183)
Case Number:S-11-0183Case Docketed On:08/09/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:CHARLES MORONESE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHARLES MORONESE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCharles MoroneseDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 34
Citation:271 P.3d 1011

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/09/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/12/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion - amendedRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
09/26/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/09/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/29/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/09/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/08/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanding. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/28/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal