judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JEFFREY L. STREET

Case Information: 11-BG-0304
Short Caption:IN RE: JEFFREY L. STREETClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN523-10Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJeffrey L. Street NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of the State of Oregon suspending respondent for one year, with four months of the suspension to be imposed immediately and eight months stayed pending completion of a two year probation.
03/10/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of a letter addressed to respondent advising him of the recommendation by Bar Counsel to suspend respondent on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and of respondent's requirement in filing a compliant affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14.
04/05/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Oregon suspending respondent from the practice of law for one year, with four months of the suspension to be imposed immediately and with eight monts stayed pending completion of a two year probation, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended for one year from the practice of law in the District of Columbia, with eight months stayed in favor of two years' probation, as outlined in the Oregon order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline Bar Counsel (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred t othe Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attentiion is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
05/19/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciiprocal discipline.
05/20/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of bar counsel - proposed order
06/23/2011FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Jeffrey L. Street, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of one year, nunc pro tunc to April 5, 2011, eight months of the suspension is hereby stayed and respondent shall serve a two year probationary period susbject to the terms imposed by the State of Oregon. (BR,TE,FA)