judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33597
Short Caption:SIMS (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44350
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 970185Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00199
01/20/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Arraignment--2/10/98, 4/14/98; Hearings--8/25/98, 9/2/98; Trial--9/2/98, 9/3/98; Sentencing--12/8/98. To Court Reporter: Barbara Johnson. 99-00398
01/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/10/98 and 05/14/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Barbara J. Johnson. 99-00478
01/25/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 09/25/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Edward Von Rudin. 99-00479
01/25/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 09/02/98; 09/03/98; and 12/08/98. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Barbara Johnson. 99-00480
02/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00746
02/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: March 2, 1999. 99-01130
03/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01390
03/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-01391
04/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02992
05/12/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03827
05/12/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/14/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 1999. 99-03827