judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARVY A. FINGER, TRUSTEE v. LARRY W. MORRIS, VICTOR MORRIS AND NED MORRIS

Case: B-2824
B-2824
06/28/1971
Application for Writ of Error
MARVY A. FINGER, TRUSTEE
LARRY W. MORRIS, VICTOR MORRIS AND NED MORRIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/23/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/16/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/26/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/24/1971Response to Motion filed
12/23/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/16/1971Reply to Response
07/26/1971Response to Petition
06/28/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/28/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marvy A. Finger, TrusteePetitioner
Larry W. Morris, Victor Morris and Ned MorrisRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information