Case Information: 77959 | |||
Short Caption: | HORVATH (TAMAS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 77959-COA , 80237 , 82016 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C288087 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/14/2019 | How Submitted: | On Record And Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/23/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | ||
01/23/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | 19-03679 | |
01/23/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days (SC) | 19-03681 | |
01/30/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | 19-04708 | |
02/04/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | 19-05215 | |
02/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (SC). | 19-07571 | |
03/01/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the transcript request form received via E-Flex on February 19, 2019. (SC). | 19-09476 | |
03/01/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/02/18, 09/20/18, 05/10/18, 04/16/18, 01/17/18, 10/18/17, 06/29/17. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. (SC). | 19-09477 | |
03/08/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa A. Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/29/17, 10/18/17, 01/17/18, 04/16/18, 09/20/18, 11/02/18. (SC) | 19-10539 | |
05/17/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 6, 2019. (SC). | 19-21834 | |
06/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol I. (SC) | 19-23955 | |
06/03/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol II. (SC) | 19-23959 | |
06/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Appendix Volumes 1 & 2). (SC) | 19-24129 | |
06/05/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | 19-24352 | |
06/12/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Appendix Volumes 1 & 2). (SC) | 19-25471 | |
07/01/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | 19-28161 | |
08/05/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED AUGUST 6, 2019). (SC) | ||
08/06/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | 19-32941 | |
08/06/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Permit an Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | 19-33090 | |
08/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | 19-33091 | |
08/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief was filed on August 6, 2019. (SC). | 19-34077 | |
08/14/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC). | ||
11/14/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | 19-46692 | |
11/14/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | ||
02/18/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | ||
03/16/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | ||
03/16/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | 20-10155 | |
03/16/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | ||
04/22/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 26, 2020. (SC) | 20-10155 |