judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STUART VS. OASIS RESIDENTIAL

Case Information: 34635
Short Caption:STUART VS. OASIS RESIDENTIALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A358440Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/1999 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07290
08/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cook & Kelesis--check no. 3974.
08/09/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 1, 1999 through March 12, 1999. To Court Reporter: Patty Smith. 99-07306
08/16/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-12294
01/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 10 days to comply fully with this court's notice regarding the case appeal statement issued on April 14,1999; 15 days to file the docketing statement, upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal; 100 days to file the opening brief and appendix; court reporter: 30 days to file a certified transcript. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants-Massi and Cook firm). 00-00619
01/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Correcting Clerical Error. The reference to the case appeal statement issued on April 14, 1999, is hereby corrected to read "August 9, 1999." 00-00996
01/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance pursuant to Order Filed January 13, 2000. 00-01297
01/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: August 11, 1999. 00-01306
01/28/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01420
02/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-01609
02/11/2000Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 00-02201
02/16/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 03/02/99; 03/08/99; 03/09/99; and 03/10/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 00-02457
03/09/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Affidavit from court reporter Renee Silvaggio. 00-03724
03/16/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Court reporter Renee Silvaggio shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcripts requested in this matter. 00-04152
03/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Filing of Transcript and Briefing Schedule. 00-04303
03/22/2000MotionFiled Motion. Joinder in Motion for Extension of Time for Filing of Transcript and Briefing Schedule. 00-04605
04/12/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/3/99, 3/4/99, 3/5/99, 3/11/99. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-05878
04/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporters Renee Silvaggio and Patsy Smith shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file any remaining requested transcripts. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to inform this court in writing of (1) the specific dates of the transcripts which have not yet been filed and are currently in preparation and (2) the court reporter requested to prepare and file those transcripts. 00-06068
04/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. (Albert D. Massi) 00-06938
04/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. (Marc P. Cook) 00-06940
05/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Patsy K. Smith. The court reporter for the 3/12/99 hearing was Renee Silvaggio. 00-07375
05/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to Provide Proof of Service to court reporter Patsy K. Smith. Due Date: 5 days.
05/11/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 12, 1999. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-07872
05/23/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Affidavit from court reporter Patsy K.Smith. 00-08638
06/06/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Jennifer O'Hara. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box-No Date. 00-09485
06/06/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant Jennifer O'Hara. 00-09486
06/16/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Tanya Stuart. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/15/00. 00-10324
06/16/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Appellant Tanya Suart. 00-10326
06/23/2000MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion Requesting Supreme Court to Direct District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Trial Exhibits 43, 46, and 48. 00-10763
06/27/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Allow Respondent to Submit Single Responding Brief to Appellants' Individual Opening Briefs, and to Extend Time for Respondent to Submit Responding Brief. 00-10982
07/03/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant Stuart's Response to Respondent's Motion Requesting Supreme Court to Direct District Court Clerk to Transmit the Original Trial Exhibits "43," "46," and "48." 00-11269
07/14/2000MotionReceived Response to Motion. Appellant O-Hara's Response to Respondent's Motion Requesting Supreme Court to Direct District Court Clerk to Transmit the Original Trial Exhibits "43", "46", and "48". 00-12183
08/10/2000BriefReceived Answering Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 8/8/00. 00-13890
08/10/2000AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-13891
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 27, 2000, the parties to this appeal filed a stipulation extending the time for respondent to file a combined answering brief up to and including August 9, 2000. We approve that stipulation. The clerk of this court shall file respondent's answering brief and appendix provisionally received on August 10, 2000. On June 23, 2000, respondent filed a motion requesting the transmittal of 'original trial exhibits 43, 46, and 48.' On July 3, 2000, appellant Stuart filed a response. On July 14, 2000, appellant O'Hara submitted an untimely response to respondent's motion to transmit the exhibits. In the interest of judicial economy, the clerk of this court shall file the response provisionally submitted on July 14, 2000. We grant respondent's motion to transmit exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court, the 'original trial exhibits 43, 46, and 48,' within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. We will disregard any documents improperly included in any appendix and any inappropriate references to materials or matters outside the district court record. 00-15028
08/28/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant O-Hara's Response to Respondent's Motion Requesting Supreme Court to Direct District Court Clerk to Transmit the Original Trial Exhibits "43", "46", and "48". 00-12183
08/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. 00-13890
08/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-13891
08/31/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant, Jennifer O'Hara, Reply Brief. Mailed on: 8/29/00. 00-15452
09/12/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant Tanya Stuart's Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 9/11/00. 00-16043
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04770
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment and order of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09754
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: 43, 46 & 48 this day. 01-10315
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10315