judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN

Case Heading (S-07-0064)
Case Number:S-07-0064Case Docketed On:03/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR. v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN
Full Title:WALKER PATTERSON INMAN, JR., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAISHA LORAINE WILLIAMS, f/k/a DAISHA LORAINE INMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWalker Patterson Inman Jr.John D. Bowers
AppelleeDaisha Loraine WilliamsWilliam L. Combs
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 81
Citation:187 P.3d 868

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
06/15/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/18/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/12/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Kite recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from the District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts and Exhibits. (Certification reflects five volumes)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/15/2007Order - Assignment of judge - recusing Chief Justice Voigt, assigning Keith G. KautzOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
08/15/2007Order - Assignment of judge - recusing Justice Kite, assigning Judge John R. Perry.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
08/22/2007Order - Assignment of Judge Jeffrey A. Donnell and recusal of Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/27/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellee regarding concerns about due process with a "Federal Crime Report."CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
02/27/2008Correspondence - Outgoing - responded to appellee's letter with approval by Justice Hill, and returned "Federal Crime Report."CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/26/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from appellee, Ms. Inman regarding when decision might be published.EventPhone CallFinal
07/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/31/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/06/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for by Kenneth D. Roberts.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal