judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRELL J. HOLMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0310
Short Caption:DARRELL J. HOLMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL3976-01Filed Date:03/03/2011

Opening Event Date:03/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/16/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/21/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/31/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarrell J. Holmes YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Shane N. WallerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/22/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 3, 2011, and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Matthew Leefer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3(A). (By: JAC)
03/22/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Matthew Leefer, Esquire
03/23/2011RECORD INDEX
03/23/2011RECORD COPIES
03/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
05/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 20, 2011 (no oppo)
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
08/12/2011LodgedLetter From Appellant regarding lack of communication from court-appointed counsel. (Appellant)
08/16/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the August 12 pro se letter received from appellant
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) until completion of transcripts (dfe)Granted
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix (for RT reasons)
09/14/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (193pgs/Ramos) 11/29-30/04 proc.
09/14/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (92pgs/Kaczorowski) 12/9/04 proc. (Morning)
09/14/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (28pgs/Rogers) 12/9/04 proc. (Afternoon) w/CD
09/14/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/26/2011FiledStatement regarding - the status of the receipt of transcripts (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until January 6, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
11/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until January 6, 2012
01/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before February 15, 2012
02/15/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/15/2012FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
03/16/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/16/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
04/18/2012FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to supplement the record with documents contained in the appendix to appellee's brief
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/21/2012FiledSubmitted To Judge Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Beckwith,
07/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
07/31/2012FiledMandate
11/06/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)