judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING FRANK E. MOHR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY

Case Heading (S-11-0170)
Case Number:S-11-0170Case Docketed On:07/20/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING FRANK E. MOHR v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY
Full Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING FRANK E. MOHR, Appellant (Objector), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFrank E. Mohr Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Jay Arthur Jerde
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeFarmers Canal CompanyMichael S. Messenger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/21/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other -Disrict Court order re pending motions.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
07/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Copies of Motions filed in District Court (2)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/29/2011Motion - Stay - Briefing Schedule; To Stay Enforcement of Orders Entered on June 02, 2011 and on June 30, 2011; To Order District court to Resolve all Outstanding MotionsMotionStay - otherFinal
08/02/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
08/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - State's motion to dismiss appeal and memorandum in support; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Response/Objection - Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Wyoming. Captioned "Mohr's Motion and Memorandum to Deny State's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum in Support"Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Pleading filed in District Court requesting Index of RecordNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Motion filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/31/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/02/2011Event - Rejected Filing - brief of appellant. Original will be returned to appellant if requested.EventRejected FilingFinal
09/02/2011Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant regarding brief.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
09/06/2011Brief - Appellant. Received call from appellant indicating that he wants the brief filed regardless of the dismissal. Considered filed this date. Also received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
09/13/2011Motion - Reconsideration and Reverse Order Granting Motion to Dismiss AppealMotionReconsiderationFinal
10/04/2011Order - Denying Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderDenyFinal
10/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal