judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ROGER H. MOORE

Case Information: 11-BG-0301
Short Caption:IN RE: ROGER H. MOOREClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN125-09Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Becky NealNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentRoger H. Moore NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011PETITION FOR REINSTATEMENT
03/14/2011REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. The Hearing Committee recommends that the petition be denied.
04/04/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that Bar Counsel supports the report and recommendation of the Ad Hoc Hearing Committee. Bar Counsel takes exception, however, insofar as the Committee failed to make certain additional factual findings and failed to adopt Bar Counsel's recommendation that the nature and circumstances of petitioner's criminal conduct warrant permanent disbarment
04/06/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/06/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
08/05/2011FiledLetter From Dwight L. Pringle, Esquire requesting notification of action by the court in this matter. (Petitioner)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/17/2011FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Respondent)
10/17/2011FiledAnswer/Response to petitioner's request for oral argument, and request that the court remove the case from the summary calendar and establish a briefing schedule on Bar Counsel's exceptions. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
11/02/2011LodgedReceived respondent's reply to Bar Counsel's response to respondent's motion for oral argument. (Respondent)
11/16/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
01/05/2012FiledDenied - Accordingly, we accept the Hearing Committee's recommendation and deny the petition for reinstatement. (GL,BR,ST)