judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPENCER VS. SPENCER

Case Information: 36465
Short Caption:SPENCER VS. SPENCERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36914 , 54489
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D238394Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/28/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/21/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12600
07/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/28/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/02/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cliff W. Marcek--check no. 2905.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 31, 2000. 00-13466
06/21/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-10526
08/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-13487
09/04/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-14856
09/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-15928
09/21/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.