judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREA STOKES v. DAVID STOKES

Case Heading (S-10-0027)
Case Number:S-10-0027Case Docketed On:02/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:ANDREA STOKES v. DAVID STOKES
Full Title:ANDREA STOKES, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAVID STOKES, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndrea StokesTracy L. Zubrod
AppelleeDavid StokesBernard Q. Phelan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/18/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for an Extension of Tiem to file Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/01/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/06/2010Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Mr. Phelen who advised that the parties are now remarried.EventPhone CallFinal
08/10/2010Event - Phone Call - Left message for Ms. Zubrod regarding message from Mr. Phelen and asking if she will be submitting a motion for dismissal.EventPhone CallFinal
08/11/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from Ms. Zubrod. She is waiting to hear from her client and will update court soon.EventPhone CallFinal
08/12/2010Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Ms. Zubrod. Her client does not wish to voluntarily dismiss her appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
08/18/2010Order - Show Cause Why This Appeal Should Not Be Dismissed as MootOrderShow causeFinal
08/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Order signed for by agent for Tracy Zubrod on 8/19/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/09/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
09/14/2010Event - Phone Call - Called Ms. Zubrod regarding hard copies of motion and proposed order. She will get them out today.EventPhone CallFinal
09/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/17/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/16/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal