judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ST. PIERRE (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36464
Short Caption:ST. PIERRE (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9806011Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/21/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12597
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-13536
01/17/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-01021
01/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Representation of Respondents. 01-01697
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-03391
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03760
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2001. 01-03760