judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRAN HISLER V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0338
Short Caption:FRAN HISLER V. D.C. DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB093-04Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/17/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorGallaudet UniversityN
Melissa J. Townsend NN
Curtis B. HaneYY
IntervenorPma InsuranceN
Melissa J. Townsend YN
Curtis B. HaneYY
PetitionerFran Hisler N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Tonya A. SappNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & OAG
04/20/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE - Gallaudet University and PMA Insurance Group (no oppo)
05/05/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Gallaudet University and PMA Insurance Group as intervenors in this matter. (ETW)
03/30/2012FiledRecord On Appeal (See 11-AA-207 for the record)
06/13/2012FiledBriefing Order
06/13/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
06/13/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
06/18/2012FiledBrief (Intervenor Gallaudet University, Intervenor Pma Insurance)
07/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
07/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 9/12/12
09/12/2012FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Respondent)
09/12/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/16/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
10/16/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/01/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Intervenor Gallaudet University, Intervenor Pma Insurance)
11/02/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Petitioner)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/16/2013FiledAppearance - of Curtis B. Hanes (Intervenor Gallaudet University)
01/17/2013FiledArgued before Judges Beckwith, Easterly, Ruiz
02/04/2013FiledMotion To Remand (Intervenor Gallaudet University, Intervenor Pma Insurance)
02/06/2013FiledOpposition to the employer and insurer's limited motion to remand (Petitioner)
10/18/2013FiledRemanded (MOJ) Beckwith and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Ruiz, Senior Judge
11/18/2013FiledMandate