judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSON VS. TEETER

Case Information: 36454
Short Caption:ANDERSON VS. TEETERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000255AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/31/2000 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brooke & Shaw--check no. 13402.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12501
07/20/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. 00-12578
07/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we hereby grant appellants a temporary stay of all proceedings below pending receipt and consideration of respondents' opposition to the motion for an injunction and pending further order of this court. 00-12588
07/31/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/31/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Injunctive Relief Pending Appeal. 00-13194
08/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Order to Show Cause re: Contempt. 00-13437
08/03/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. to Motion for Injunction. 00-13438
08/09/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Show Cause re: Contempt. 00-13852
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to [opposition to] Motion to Show Cause re Contempt. 00-13913
08/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion for Order to Show Cause. On August 3, 2000, appellants filed a motion for an order to show cause why respondents should not be held in contempt for violating our July 20, 2000, stay order. Having considered the submissions from both parties, we conclude that respondents' rescheduling of the foreclosure sale, without more, did not violate our stay order. We deny appellants' motion for an order to show cause. fn1[In light of our order, we deny as moot appellants' motion to file a reply to respondents' opposition to the motion for an order to show cause.] In addition, appellants filed a motion for leave to file a reply to respondents' opposition to the motion for stay. Appellants' motion is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to file appellants' reply, which was received on August 3, 2000. 00-15350
08/31/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. 00-13439
08/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Matuska: returned unfiled, the original Reply to Opposition to Motion for Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt, received August 10, 2000.
09/14/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-16224
09/14/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-16225
10/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. fn1[Appellant's July 20, 2000 motion for injunction pending appeal is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK 00-18439
10/18/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.