judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKY L. DOUGHERTY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0016)
Case Number:S-10-0016Case Docketed On:01/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:RICKY L. DOUGHERTY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICKY L. DOUGHERTY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRicky L. DoughertyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 127
Citation:239 P.3d 1176 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/25/2010Event - Other - at Court's request, Case Nos. S-10-0016 and S-10-0017 are no longer linked, and will be heard and decided separately.EventOtherFinal
05/25/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2010Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk re Trial ExhibitEventPhone CallFinal
08/16/2010Record - Other - contacted district court clerk and requested State's Exhibit 1.RecordOtherFinal
08/17/2010Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk, one additional volume, exhibits - labeled as Volume IV.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
09/21/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court. Justice Voigt files a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Hill joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card (returned with no signature or date, printed tracking information and put in file)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal