judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DEMATTEI (MARK)

Case Information: 36455
Short Caption:STATE VS. DEMATTEI (MARK)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P1548Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12486
07/25/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 00-12818
08/30/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15294
08/30/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-15295
09/01/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 00-15489
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. To date, no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 00-17121
09/29/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Mark Anthony Demattei hereby associates the Law Office of Richard F. Cornell with the Law Office of David R. Houston as his counsel for the purposed of this appeal. 00-17265
09/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17266
10/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track response shall be filed and served within 20 days of this order. 00-17810
10/26/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave of Court to File Fast Track Response in Excess of Ten Pages. 00-18989
10/26/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response. 00-18990
11/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on October 26, 2000. 00-19208
11/01/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18990
11/01/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-18991
01/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court granting appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-01993
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02080
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2001. 01-02080