judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKY L. DOUGHERTY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0017)
Case Number:S-10-0017Case Docketed On:01/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RICKY L. DOUGHERTY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICKY L. DOUGHERTY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRicky L. DoughertyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 116
Citation:237 P.3d 403

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/25/2010Event - Other - at Court's request, Case Nos. S-10-0016 and S-10-0017 are no longer linked, and will be heard and decided separately.EventOtherFinal
05/28/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/17/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for by agent for Warden at Medium Correctional Facility on 8/18/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/02/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/02/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record and mandate signed for 9/3/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal