judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSON VS. WINTER

Case Information: 36438
Short Caption:ANDERSON VS. WINTERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32669 , 40527
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9701234Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bradley Paul Elley--check no. 0899.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants.) 00-12272
08/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13314
08/08/2000Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 00-13752
11/14/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 14, 2000. 00-19980
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant's shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 00-21189
12/26/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-22497
01/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01313
02/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01495
02/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 23, 2001. 01-01495