judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REG. AUTH., INC. V. AMERIVET SECURITIES

Case Information: 11-CV-0323
Short Caption:FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REG. AUTH., INC. V. AMERIVET SECURITIESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5767-09Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/31/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFinancial Industry Regulatory Authority Inc.N
Douglas R. CoxYN
F. Joseph WarinNN
Scott P. MartinNN
AppelleeAmerivet Securities N
Jonathan W. CuneoNN
Monica MillerNY
William H. AndersonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 ORDERED that COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER, or how the collateral doctrine applies, specifically identifying the authority relied upon. See Finkelstein, Thompson & Loughran v. Hemispherx Biopharma, Inc.... (BY: ETW)
03/28/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/07/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause to May 13, 2011 (no oppo).
04/12/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S MARCH 28, 2011 OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN MAY 13, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
05/09/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause (unopposed)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED... and appellant's response to the OTSC shall be fled NO LATER THAN JUNE 10, 2011. NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED... (BY: ETW) LW
06/10/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
10/12/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte DISCHARGING OTSC...
10/12/2011FiledInitial Order
11/01/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledRecord Index
11/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (5-pgs/tape 10/1/10 proc.)
11/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (27-pgs/tape 12/10/10 proc.)
11/17/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 ( 18-pgs/tape 2/3/11 proc.)w/cd
11/17/2011FiledRecord Completed
11/21/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 13, 2012 (no oppo). (Appellant)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to February 13, 2012 (no oppo). (Appellant)
02/13/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/13/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
04/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
05/02/2012FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Inc., Appellee Securities)
05/09/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
05/09/2012FiledDismissed
05/31/2012FiledMandate