judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS AERONAUTICS COMMISSION, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES COMPANY, TEXAS AERONAUTICS COMMISSION AND SOUTHWEST AIRLINES COMPANY v. CHARLES O. BETTS, DISTRICT JUDGE, ET AL.

Case: B-2809
B-2809
06/17/1971
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
TEXAS AERONAUTICS COMMISSION, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES COMPANY, TEXAS AERONAUTICS COMMISSION AND SOUTHWEST AIRLINES COMPANY
CHARLES O. BETTS, DISTRICT JUDGE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/22/1971Supplemental Brief filedRelator
07/06/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
06/28/1971Supplemental Brief filedRelator
06/28/1971Post submission brief filedRelator
06/25/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
06/21/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
06/17/1971Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
06/17/1971Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/22/1971Supplemental Brief filed
07/07/1971Opinion issued
07/06/1971Post submission brief filed
06/28/1971Supplemental Brief filed
06/28/1971Post submission brief filed
06/25/1971Post submission brief filed
06/21/1971Response to Petition
06/17/1971Order from Lower Court filed
06/17/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
06/17/1971Brief in Support of Petition
06/17/1971Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
06/17/1971Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwest Airlines CompanyRelator
Texas Aeronautics Commission and Southwest Airlines CompanyRelator
Texas Aeronautics CommissionRelator
Charles O. Betts, District Judge, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information