judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLAREMONT SANDS VS. GRIFFENKRANZ

Case Information: 36437
Short Caption:CLAREMONT SANDS VS. GRIFFENKRANZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A412336Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Eva Cisneros-check no. 1956.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12258
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of Entry of June 9, 2000, Order. Due Date: 10 days
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Clark County Clerk. There has been no Notice of Entry filed in this case. 00-13190
12/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Defendants' are going to vacate the appeal. 00-21114
02/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 01-02667
02/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On February 9, 2001, appellant filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellant's notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal and, cause appearing, the motion is granted and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK 01-03116
02/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.