judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JIMMY DEAN SMALLFOOT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0192)
Case Number:S-11-0192Case Docketed On:08/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JIMMY DEAN SMALLFOOT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JIMMY DEAN SMALLFOOT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJimmy Dean SmallfootDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
David L. Delicath
Joshua Beau Taylor
Benjamin J. Sherman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 39
Citation:272 P.3d 314

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
10/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation or record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/23/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; consent of client; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joshua Taylor for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/11/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Joshua Beau Taylor, Student Director, PAP, argument by Mr. Taylor for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/11/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/16/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 4/5/12.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal