judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

YAKINI GRAHAM-PRENTICE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0348
Short Caption:YAKINI GRAHAM-PRENTICE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17605-10Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYakini Graham-Prentice YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Karen Shinskie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
03/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) T. Gail Maddox-Levine, Esquire
04/06/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (143pgs/Tape) 3/2/11 proc.
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (97pgs/Tape) 3/3/11 proc. w/CD
04/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/03/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (defendant's exhibits #1 (incident based event report dated 9/19/10~ defendant's exhibits #2 incident based event report dated 9/19/10) sealed in yellow envelope
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COPIES
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 7, 2011 (no oppo)
05/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/06/2011APPENDIX
08/10/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/10/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Farrell
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/22/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing until April 28, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing to 4/28/12.
05/02/2012FiledMandate