judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY DANCY V. SARA VAQUERO

Case Information: 11-FM-0330
Short Caption:ANTHONY DANCY V. SARA VAQUEROClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO4106-09Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Dancy YPro SeN
AppelleeSara Vaquero N
Virginia KlingNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 7, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
03/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/28/2011TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss
04/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (17 pgs/tape) 1/25/11 proc.
04/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (10 pgs/tape) 2/4/11 proc.
04/13/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (95 pgs/tape) 2/26/10 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/18/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. It is ****MORE****
05/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF and limited appendix shall be filed w/n 40days and appellee's brief w/n 30 days thereafter. (FITEST)
07/12/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Granted
08/09/2011FiledOrder directing appellant's brief and the limited appendix in 20 days accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and holding appellee's motion to dismiss in abeyance.
09/14/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)
09/14/2011FiledDismissed
10/07/2011FiledMandate