judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRICK L. WIMPLE V. GMAC MORTGAGE

Case Information: 11-CV-0329
Short Caption:DARRICK L. WIMPLE V. GMAC MORTGAGEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR7451-10Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarrick L. Wimple N
Jamison B. TaylorYY
AppelleeGmac MortgageN
Richard D. Holzheimer YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/30/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 10, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/19/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/7/11) (elp)
05/06/2011RECORD INDEX
05/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (13-pgs/tape 1/7/11 proc.)w/cd
05/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/20/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
07/20/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/20/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/2011FiledMotion for escrow depostits (Appellee)Denied
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/25/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR ESCROW DEPOSIT
09/21/2011FiledOrder Denying APPELLEE'S MOTION TO IMPOSE BOND OR PROTECTIVE ORDER
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Wagner, King, Nebeker
01/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Wagner, Nebeker, and King, Senior Judges.)
02/03/2012FiledMandate