judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLON (ANDRE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36444
Short Caption:COLON (ANDRE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29009 , 29018 , 29274
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C132385Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/05/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12283
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Request for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal filed in district court on July 13, 2000. 00-12285
07/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 7/18/00. Due Date: 10 days
08/04/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on July 18, 2000. 00-13527
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36444, 36521, 36527, 36545, 36567, 36580, 36598. 00-17085
01/05/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 12. 01-00312
01/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA 02-20866
12/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-21236
12/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2003. 02-21236