judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ADELINE Z. CONE v. S. E. CONE

Case: A-4446
A-4446
12/31/1953
Application for Writ of Error
ADELINE Z. CONE
S. E. CONE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/08/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/27/1954Opinion issued
01/23/1954Response to Motion filed
01/12/1954Motion to dismissFiling granted
12/31/1953Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/31/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Adeline Z. ConePetitioner
S. E. ConeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information