judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRESFIELD (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 37300

Case Information: 38382
Short Caption:PRESFIELD (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 37300Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 37300 *, 38382
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0009042Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/06/2002 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/06/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14431
09/04/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 19, 2001 and April 30, 2001. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 01-14841
10/08/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Full Briefing. 01-16875
10/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 8, 2001. After reviewing the documents submitted in this appeal, we have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief within 40 days after the date of this order. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. fn1[On September 4, 2001, a certified transcript was filed in this court. Should either party cite to portions of transcripts not previously filed in this court, the party shall file a transcript request form.] 01-18214
11/13/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/13/01. 01-18880
11/13/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-18881
12/17/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 16, 2002. 01-21228
01/18/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01314
01/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 18, 2002. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief by February 15, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-01493
02/19/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/15/02. Signed by: Richard W. Sears. 02-03138
02/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-03140
03/14/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/14/02. Signed by: James P. Logan. 02-04674
07/08/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on September 6, 2002, at 9:30 a.m. (En Banc)
08/27/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/06/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Court En Banc. EN BANC
12/20/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Remanded." fn2[We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. See NRAP 3(b).] Before the Court En Banc-Maupin, J., concurring. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85 EN BANC. Nos. 37300/38382. 02-21794
01/14/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00514
01/14/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2003. 03-00514
03/03/2003MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to file Documents in Proper Person. Nos. 37300/38382. (03-09250)
06/03/2003MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recall the Remittitur. Nos. 37300/38382. (03-09252)
10/27/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 20, 2002, this court entered an Opinion remanding these consolidated appeals to district court. The remittitur issued on January 14, 2003, divesting this court of jurisdiction. On June 3, 2003, appellant Roy A. O'Guinn submitted proper person motions to file documents and to recall the remittitur. fn1[Because we elect to resolve the motions on the merits, we direct the clerk to file the motions. However, we decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). Nos. 37300/38382. (03-17922)
10/27/2003MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to file documents in Proper Person. Nos. 37300/38382. (03-09250)
10/27/2003MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Recall the Remittitur. Nos. 37300/38382. (03-09252)