judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE ELLA MAE AUSTIN; YVONNE AUSTIN, APLT

Case Information: 11-PR-0251
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE ELLA MAE AUSTIN; YVONNE AUSTIN, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM1636-04Filed Date:02/16/2011

Opening Event Date:02/16/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantYvonne Austin N
Bruce E. GardnerNY
AppelleeEstate of Ella Mae AustinN
Jerry L. HunterNN
AppelleeJerry L. HunterNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/16/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/10/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed, EITHER for having been PREMATURELY FILED...OR FOR LACK OF STANDING...SEE HARDCOPY It is (BY: ETW)
03/10/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/30/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEto 4/30/11
04/05/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that appellant's response to this court March 10, 2011 OTSC shall be filed NO LATER THAN APRIL 18, 2011. (JAC) LW
04/19/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated March 10, 2011
04/21/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (6-pgs/tape 10/1/08 proc.)
04/21/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (59-pgs/burr 4/19/10 proc.)
04/21/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (11-pgs/hawkins 12/17/10 proc.)w/cd
04/25/2011RECORD INDEX
05/24/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION as having been PREMATURELY FILED since the 6/23/10 petition for attorney fees remains pending, and...SEE HARDCOPY (FIBEKG)
05/24/2011DISMISSED
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
06/08/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
06/15/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (FIBEKG)
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
07/12/2011FiledTMC - 2nd motion for consideration
09/02/2011FiledOrder Denying Second Motion for Reconsideration
09/20/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider - of dismissal for lack of jurisdiction (3rd motion) (Appellant Austin)Denied
09/21/2011FiledTMC/3RD MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
11/30/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
12/14/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate