judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL MARINO CASTILLO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0157)
Case Number:S-11-0157Case Docketed On:06/29/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:PAUL MARINO CASTILLO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PAUL MARINO CASTILLO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul Marino CastilloDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Benjamin J. Sherman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 3
Citation:268 P.3d 245

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
09/27/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young, Joshua Beau Taylor and Benjamin J. Sherman to appear on behalf of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/18/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/05/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/25/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal