judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. BEACH

Case Information: 33576
Short Caption:STATE, BUSINESS & INDUSTRY VS. BEACHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A386906Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Leavitt, TerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00103
01/14/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 09/30/98 and 11/23/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio/Patsy Smith (hand delivered 01/14/99). 99-00260
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Terry V. Leavitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/21/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00428
06/21/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. Settlement Agreement for Dismissal of Appeal. 99-05374
07/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 99-05967
07/07/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.