judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEITH KENNETH ZUMBERGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0255)
Case Number:S-09-0255Case Docketed On:12/10/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:KEITH KENNETH ZUMBERGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEITH KENNETH ZUMBERGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKeith Kenneth ZumbergeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Michael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, Trial
Opinion Number:2010 WY 111
Citation:236 P.3d 1028

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/10/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/26/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/28/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/07/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/27/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/05/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal